E | 05/19/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/19/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2613 | |
E | 05/09/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2148 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3297 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2084 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2148 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#722 | Journal Page: 2945 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2945 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2945 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2933 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2933 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB2009 | Journal Page: 2933 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 571 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 571 | |
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |