House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2165
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|