Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB121 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis, Carona, Hinojosa S.B. No. 121
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 7, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 121 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in
 criminal cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 38.20 to read as follows:
 Art. 38.20.  PHOTOGRAPH AND LIVE LINEUP IDENTIFICATION
 PROCEDURES
 Sec. 1.  In this article, "institute" means the Bill
 Blackwood Law Enforcement Management Institute of Texas located at
 Sam Houston State University.
 Sec. 2.  This article applies only to a law enforcement
 agency of this state or of a county, municipality, or other
 political subdivision of this state that employs peace officers who
 conduct photograph or live lineup identification procedures in the
 routine performance of the officers' official duties.
 Sec. 3.  (a)  Each law enforcement agency shall adopt,
 implement, and as necessary amend a detailed written policy
 regarding the administration of photograph and live lineup
 identification procedures in accordance with this article. A law
 enforcement agency may adopt:
 (1)  the model policy adopted under Subsection (b); or
 (2)  the agency's own policy that, at a minimum,
 conforms to the requirements of Subsection (c).
 (b)  The institute, in consultation with large, medium, and
 small law enforcement agencies and with law enforcement
 associations, scientific experts in eyewitness memory research,
 and appropriate organizations engaged in the development of law
 enforcement policy, shall develop, adopt, and disseminate to all
 law enforcement agencies in this state a model policy and
 associated training materials regarding the administration of
 photograph and live lineup identification procedures.  The
 institute shall provide for a period of public comment before
 adopting the policy and materials.
 (c)  The model policy or any other policy adopted by a law
 enforcement agency under Subsection (a) must:
 (1)  be based on:
 (A)  credible field, academic, or laboratory
 research on eyewitness memory;
 (B)  relevant policies, guidelines, and best
 practices designed to reduce erroneous eyewitness identifications
 and to enhance the reliability and objectivity of eyewitness
 identifications; and
 (C)  other relevant information as appropriate;
 and
 (2)  address the following topics:
 (A)  the selection of photograph and live lineup
 filler photographs or participants;
 (B)  instructions given to a witness before
 conducting a photograph or live lineup identification procedure;
 (C)  the documentation and preservation of
 results of a photograph or live lineup identification procedure,
 including the documentation of witness statements, regardless of
 the outcome of the procedure;
 (D)  procedures for administering a photograph or
 live lineup identification procedure to an illiterate person or a
 person with limited English language proficiency;
 (E)  for a live lineup identification procedure,
 if practicable, procedures for assigning an administrator who is
 unaware of which member of the live lineup is the suspect in the
 case or alternative procedures designed to prevent opportunities to
 influence the witness;
 (F)  for a photograph identification procedure,
 procedures for assigning an administrator who is capable of
 administering a photograph array in a blind manner or in a manner
 consistent with other proven or supported best practices designed
 to prevent opportunities to influence the witness; and
 (G)  any other procedures or best practices
 supported by credible research or commonly accepted as a means to
 reduce erroneous eyewitness identifications and to enhance the
 objectivity and reliability of eyewitness identifications.
 Sec. 4.  (a)  Not later than December 31 of each
 odd-numbered year, the institute shall review the model policy and
 training materials adopted under this article and shall modify the
 policy and materials as appropriate.
 (b)  Not later than September 1 of each even-numbered year,
 each law enforcement agency shall review its policy adopted under
 this article and shall modify that policy as appropriate.
 Sec. 5.  (a)  Any evidence or expert testimony presented by
 the state or the defendant on the subject of eyewitness
 identification is admissible only subject to compliance with the
 Texas Rules of Evidence.  Evidence of compliance with the model
 policy or any other policy adopted under this article or with the
 minimum requirements of this article is not a condition precedent
 to the admissibility of an out-of-court eyewitness identification.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Article 38.23 as that article relates
 to a violation of a state statute, a failure to conduct a photograph
 or live lineup identification procedure in substantial compliance
 with the model policy or any other policy adopted under this article
 or with the minimum requirements of this article does not bar the
 admission of eyewitness identification testimony in the courts of
 this state.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2011, the Bill
 Blackwood Law Enforcement Management Institute of Texas shall
 develop, adopt, and disseminate the model policy and associated
 training materials required under Article 38.20, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2012, each law enforcement
 agency to which Article 38.20, Code of Criminal Procedure, as added
 by this Act, applies shall adopt a policy as required by that
 article.
 (c)  The change in law made by Section 5, Article 38.20, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act, applies only to a
 photograph or live lineup identification procedure conducted on or
 after September 1, 2012, regardless of whether the offense to which
 the procedure is related occurred before, on, or after September 1,
 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *