House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 3649 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3649 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3519 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3520 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2195 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2126 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2126 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2126 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2126 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2126 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2126 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 2126 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Carona | Journal Page: 2124 |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |