House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|