E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4118
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 263
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|