House | 05/21/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5048 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3974 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2387 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |