Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1219 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 1219
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 18, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1219 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Internet website operated by the Public Utility
 Commission of Texas to provide information regarding a customer's
 power to choose retail electric providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  a competitive electric services market requires
 timely, accurate, and adequate information about the products and
 services offered to consumers in the market; and
 (2)  the Public Utility Commission of Texas operates an
 Internet website regarding the power to choose retail electric
 providers on which offers by those providers are published.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.110 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.110.  TEXAS ELECTRIC CHOICE WEBSITE. (a)  The
 commission shall publish and maintain a website that allows
 customers to view competitive offers from retail electric
 providers. The website must enable a user to search by zip code
 offers available to a residential customer in the user's service
 area. Retail electric providers may, but are not required to, post
 offers available to residential customers on this website.
 (b)  At a minimum, the Internet website must include:
 (1)  features that make the website accessible to
 people with disabilities;
 (2)  a clear identification, with each price offer
 posted on the website, of the category of the product as defined by
 commission rules;
 (3)  a searchable and sortable database of each retail
 electric provider offer on the website that allows the information
 to be read into a commercially available electronic database; and
 (4)  information about each of the following programs
 available in the user's service area through a state agency,
 utility, or retail electric provider:
 (A)  energy efficiency programs, including
 weatherization and rebate programs;
 (B)  distributed renewable generation policies
 and programs, including rebate programs, net metering, and policies
 affecting consumers' rights; and
 (C)  low-income utility assistance programs,
 including bill payment assistance, weatherization, and rebate
 programs.
 (c)  The commission shall establish a project to implement
 this section. The commission shall create a working committee to
 provide input on the implementation of this section that is
 composed of members of commission staff, experts in user-centered
 web design, experts in consumer-choice web design, retail electric
 providers, consumer advocates, and representatives of various
 categories of potential users of the redesigned website, including
 people with disabilities and low-income customers.
 (d)  The commission shall establish protocols relating to
 the frequency with which information posted on the website is
 updated.
 (e)  The commission shall consult and cooperate with other
 state agencies in the design, both for content and usability, of the
 website, including agencies providing low-income consumer
 assistance and energy efficiency assistance and the interagency
 coordinating group established under Section 535.053, Government
 Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 39.116, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 39.116.  NOTICE REGARDING CUSTOMER CHOICE INFORMATION.
 A retail electric provider shall include on each residential
 customer's bill a statement, in at least 12-point type on the front
 of the first page, that reads: "For more information about
 residential electric service please visit www.powertochoose.com."
 This section expires September 1, 2013 [2011].
 SECTION 4.  The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 publish and begin operation of a redesigned website as provided by
 Section 39.110, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 5.  The Public Utility Commission of Texas is
 authorized to accept funds from any source, including gifts,
 grants, or donations, for implementation of this Act. However, the
 commission may not incorporate a preference of information
 displayed directly or indirectly in favor of any funding source,
 and no entity will be required to contribute funds to have
 information posted on the site. Implementation of this Act is
 contingent on a finding by the commission that complete funding
 exists or is likely to exist to carry out the provisions of this
 Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *