House
|
05/25/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 575
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 575
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|