E | 05/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
E | 05/05/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3087 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1902 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1715 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2684 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | RV#630 | Journal Page: 2685 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2666 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2666 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB2013 | Journal Page: 2666 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Duncan | Journal Page: 1178 |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |