House | 05/03/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2259 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2090 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1292 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 578 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 578 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |