Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1286 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1286
 (Rodriguez)
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 1286:  No.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the funding of retirement systems for firefighters in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (a) and (b), Section 10.01, Chapter
 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975
 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Each municipality in which a fire department to which
 this Act applies is located shall appropriate and contribute to the
 fund an amount equal to a percentage [18.05 percent] of the
 compensation of all members during that month as follows:
 (1)  19.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date
 following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately
 preceding September 30, 2011;
 (2)  20.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date
 following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately
 preceding September 30, 2012;
 (3)  21.05 percent, for 24 pay dates of the
 municipality beginning on the first pay date following September
 30, 2012; and
 (4)  22.05 percent, for all pay dates of the
 municipality that follow the 24 pay dates referenced in Subdivision
 (3) of this subsection.
 (b)  Each firefighter shall pay into the fund each month a
 percentage [13.70 percent] of the firefighter's compensation for
 that month as follows:
 (1)  15.70 percent, for the pay dates of the
 municipality following September 30, 2010, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2011;
 (2)  16.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2011, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2012;
 (3)  16.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2012, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2013;
 (4)  17.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2013, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2014;
 (5)  17.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2014, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2015;
 (6)  18.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2015, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2016; and
 (7)  18.70 percent, for the first pay date of the
 municipality following September 30, 2016, and all subsequent pay
 dates of the municipality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.