House | 05/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4765 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 4116 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1221 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1221 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1221 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Jackson | Journal Page: 1219 |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |