House
|
05/25/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5411
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1291
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 580
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 580
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|