E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2515
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2489
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2489
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2488
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2488
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3191
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#840
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/6/11 2:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 80
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3177
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 215
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 215
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|