E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6852
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1734
|
Journal Page: 6851
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6851
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2703
|
Journal Page: 6849
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6873
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5077
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1259
|
Journal Page: 5076
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4749
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5970
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5970
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1185
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4357
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
1-V. Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 4357
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4357
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3652
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1410
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1410
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1410
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1410
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1410
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1410
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1409
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1162
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|