E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6457
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6381
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6380
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4489
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5741
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5741
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3463
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3462
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3462
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3462
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3462
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4072
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1131
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/13/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3132
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 659
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 659
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|