House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1037 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 1036 |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |