E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2515
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2488
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2488
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2488
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2338
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3736
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 3736
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3736
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2177
|
Journal Page: 3736
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Eltife
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1279
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1024
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 661
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 661
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|