Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1358 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1358
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 10, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 10, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1358 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to electronically transmitting a warrant for emergency
 detention.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 573.012, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (h-1) to
 read as follows:
 (h)  A judge or magistrate may permit an applicant who is a
 physician to present an application by:
 (1)  e-mail with the application attached as a secure
 document in a portable document format (PDF); or
 (2)  secure electronic means, including:
 (A)  satellite transmission;
 (B)  [,] closed-circuit television
 transmission;[,] or
 (C)  any other method of two-way electronic
 communication that:
 (i) [(1)]  is secure;
 (ii) [(2)]  is available to the judge or
 magistrate; and
 (iii) [(3)]  provides for a simultaneous,
 compressed full-motion video and interactive communication of
 image and sound between the judge or magistrate and the applicant.
 (h-1)  After the presentation of an application under
 Subsection (h), the judge or magistrate may transmit a warrant to
 the applicant:
 (1)  electronically, if a digital signature, as defined
 by Article 2.26, Code of Criminal Procedure, is transmitted with
 the document; or
 (2)  by e-mail with the warrant attached as a secure
 document in a portable document format (PDF), if the identifiable
 legal signature of the judge or magistrate is transmitted with the
 document.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *