E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | |||
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4000 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4034 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3702 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1447 | Journal Page: 5472 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 5472 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5472 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5374 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5374 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4618 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3650 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2270 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Harris | Journal Page: 2207 |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2207 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2207 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2064 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 661 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 661 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |