Senate | 04/27/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 724 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 662 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 662 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 536 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |