Senate | 04/20/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |