E
|
05/27/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2515
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4055
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1128
|
Journal Page: 4054
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4054
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2020
|
Journal Page: 4049
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2084
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 2084
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 935
|
Journal Page: 2084
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#320
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Motion to table prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#156
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1081
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1040
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#149
|
Journal Page: 1039
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1039
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
63-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
62-Strama
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Amended
|
48-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4)
|
Journal Page: 1024
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1020
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Motion to limit amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
47-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
38-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 997
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
9-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 963
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c) and Rule 4, Section 32(f)
|
Journal Page: 920
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 910
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 910
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Postponed
|
12:12 PM
|
Journal Page: 909
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 909
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2011
|
Referred to Voter Identification & Voter Fraud, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 329
|
House
|
02/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 329
|
House
|
01/27/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 254
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 233
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 146
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 146
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 146
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 146
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 140
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 139
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA41 Davis
|
Journal Page: 139
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 139
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 137
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Motion to table
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 117
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 112
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 112
|
Senate
|
01/26/2011
|
Motion to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 110
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 99
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 99
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Set as special order
|
|
Journal Page: 99
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
Journal Page: 54
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 54
|
Senate
|
01/12/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|