E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4151
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4151
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4151
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2689
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1192
|
Journal Page: 4375
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4375
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4375
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/19/11 7:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 4311
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4311
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2718
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1020
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1020
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1020
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1019
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1019
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1019
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1019
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1024
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 844
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|