House | 05/24/2011 | Postponed | Journal Page: 5121 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5121 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Record vote | RV#1363 | Journal Page: 5120 |
House | 05/24/2011 | Motion to table fails | Journal Page: 5120 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Amendment amended | 14-White | Journal Page: 5119 |
House | 05/24/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | 13-P. King | Journal Page: 5096 |
House | 05/24/2011 | Amended | 12-Gallego | Journal Page: 5096 |
House | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5089 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4185 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1544 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA5 Gallegos | Journal Page: 931 |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 930 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 940 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 831 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |