E
|
06/17/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR60
|
Journal Page: 6897
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6557
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6558
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1694
|
Journal Page: 6558
|
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for conference committee meeting
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Read
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#614
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amended
|
11-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
9-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
6-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
102-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2542
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#610
|
Journal Page: 2541
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
90-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2541
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2540
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
101-Laubenberg, Paxton, Frullo, Flynn, Weber, Perry, Strama, Simpson, Cain, P. King, Torres, Driver,
|
Journal Page: 2539
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
90-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2532
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
49-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amended
|
78-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 2515
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
38-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 2462
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
16-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2675
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2003
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1156
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1156
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1156
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1156
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1151
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 667
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 667
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|