House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 4060
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4060
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2376
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 667
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 667
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|