House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4617 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4184 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2612 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2523 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2523 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2523 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2523 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2482 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2482 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2482 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2269 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |