Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1425 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1425
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 12, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2; May 12, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1425 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an account for construction retainage; providing a
 civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 162.005, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (7) to read as follows:
 (7)  "Construction trust fund account" means an account
 in a federally insured financial institution into which are
 deposited only funds required by Section 162.0061(a) to be
 deposited in a construction trust fund account and other funds
 deposited by the property owner that are necessary to pay charges
 imposed on the account by the financial institution.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 162, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 162.0061 and 162.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.0061.  CONSTRUCTION TRUST FUND ACCOUNT REQUIRED IN
 CERTAIN CIRCUMSTANCES.  (a)  Except as provided by this section, a
 property owner who enters into a construction loan or financing
 agreement to pay toward the improvement of real property that is
 secured wholly or partly by a lien on the property or improvement
 shall deposit in a construction trust fund account in a financial
 institution not later than contemporaneously with payment to a
 contractor the amount retained under Subchapter E, Chapter 53, and
 other retainage, as defined by Section 53.001, retained by the
 owner from the contractor to be held in trust for the benefit of a
 person described by Section 162.003(a).  Trust funds deposited in a
 construction trust fund account under this section shall be used
 first toward the satisfaction of the owner's obligations and a
 claimant's rights under Subchapter E, Chapter 53.  Trust funds
 remaining in the construction trust fund account after the
 satisfaction of those obligations and rights may be used by the
 owner for other construction payments under this chapter or other
 purposes of the owner.  Trust funds under this section are not
 subject to seizure, offset, or taking by the financial institution
 or a creditor of the owner.  This subsection does not reduce the
 owner's obligation or liability under Subchapter E, Chapter 53.
 (b)  This section does not apply to a property owner who
 enters into a construction loan or financing agreement to pay
 toward the construction, remodeling, or repair of a single-family
 house or duplex used for residential purposes.
 (c)  This section does not apply to a property owner
 improving real property if the value of the improvement to be made
 is $250,000 or less.
 Sec. 162.008.  MANAGEMENT OF CONSTRUCTION TRUST FUND
 ACCOUNTS. (a)  If a property owner required to maintain a
 construction trust fund account under Section 162.0061 opens and
 maintains a separate construction trust fund account with the
 financial institution for each project subject to this subchapter,
 the periodic statement received from the financial institution
 must:
 (1)  refer to the account as a "construction trust
 fund" account; and
 (2)  identify the project for which the construction
 trust fund account is maintained.
 (b)  If a property owner required to maintain a construction
 trust fund account opens and maintains a construction trust fund
 account with the financial institution into which funds for two or
 more projects subject to this subchapter are deposited:
 (1)  the periodic statement received from the financial
 institution must refer to the account as a "construction trust
 fund" account; and
 (2)  the owner shall maintain an account record for the
 construction trust fund account that provides information relating
 to:
 (A)  the source and amount of the funds in the
 account and the date the funds were deposited;
 (B)  the date and amount of each disbursement from
 the account and the person to whom the funds were disbursed; and
 (C)  the current balance of the account.
 (c)  For each construction trust fund account maintained by
 the property owner under Subsection (b), the owner shall maintain
 the account record for each construction project for which trust
 funds have been deposited.
 (d)  A property owner shall, not later than the 14th day
 after receipt of a written request, provide a person who is a
 beneficiary of trust funds with a copy of:
 (1)  the periodic statement received from the financial
 institution regarding the construction trust fund account into
 which the trust funds of which the person is a beneficiary have been
 deposited; and
 (2)  the account record required to be maintained by
 the owner with respect to the construction project for which the
 trust funds have been deposited.
 SECTION 3.  Section 162.032, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  If a beneficiary of the trust funds required to be
 maintained in a construction trust fund account incurs actual
 damages as a result of the property owner's failure to establish or
 maintain a construction trust fund account in violation of Section
 162.0061 or failure to establish or maintain an account record for
 the construction trust fund account in violation of Section
 162.008, the beneficiary may recover the beneficiary's actual
 damages, reasonable attorney's fees, and a civil penalty of $500,
 in addition to any other remedy provided by law, from the property
 owner and each trustee who is an owner, officer, director, or agent
 of the property owner and who receives trust funds or controls or
 directs trust funds.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an amount retained under an original contract entered into on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  An amount retained under an
 original contract entered into before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before that
 date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *