E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/25/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3794 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5382 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3430 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5038 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3014 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 3014 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 3014 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3003 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2338 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3958 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1100 | Journal Page: 3957 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3957 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3957 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Amended | 1-Smithee | Journal Page: 3945 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3945 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3733 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3733 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2835 | Journal Page: 3733 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3829 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2387 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |