E | 05/28/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4118 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2469 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2338 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3865 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3865 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3865 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3837 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3837 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB2834 | Journal Page: 3837 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3178 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |