E
|
06/17/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6297
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1633
|
Journal Page: 6296
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6296
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4533
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4385
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5889
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5889
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3658
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3658
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3658
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3151
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4802
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4770
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4773
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4773
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4773
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4342
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1071
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 216
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 216
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|