House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Open Government, Select | Journal Page: 669 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 669 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |