Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1442 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapiro, Wentworth S.B. No. 1442
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Select Committee on Open Government;
 April 12, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 12, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1442 By:  Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application requirements for a local project
 permit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a-1), Section 245.002, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Rights to which a permit applicant is entitled under
 this chapter accrue on the filing of a required [an] original
 application or plan for development or plat application that gives
 the regulatory agency fair notice that is sufficient to enable a
 reasonably prudent person to understand [of] the project and the
 nature of the permit sought.  An application or plan is considered
 filed on the date the applicant delivers the application or plan to
 the regulatory agency or deposits the application or plan with the
 United States Postal Service by certified mail addressed to the
 regulatory agency.  A certified mail receipt obtained by the
 applicant at the time of deposit is prima facie evidence of the date
 the application or plan was deposited with the United States Postal
 Service.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *