House | 05/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4765 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2653 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2653 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2550 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 669 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 669 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |