Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1445 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1445
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 26, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1445 By:  Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the contents of reports of political contributions and
 expenditures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 254.031, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as otherwise provided by this chapter, each
 report filed under this chapter must include:
 (1)  the amount of political contributions from each
 person that in the aggregate exceed $50 and that are accepted during
 the reporting period by the person or committee required to file a
 report under this chapter, the full name and address of the person
 making the contributions, and the dates of the contributions;
 (2)  the amount of loans that are made during the
 reporting period for campaign or officeholder purposes to the
 person or committee required to file the report and that in the
 aggregate exceed $50, the dates the loans are made, the interest
 rate, the maturity date, the type of collateral for the loans, if
 any, the full name and address of the person or financial
 institution making the loans, the full name and address, principal
 occupation, and name of the employer of each guarantor of the loans,
 the amount of the loans guaranteed by each guarantor, and the
 aggregate principal amount of all outstanding loans as of the last
 day of the reporting period;
 (3)  the amount of political expenditures that in the
 aggregate exceed $50 and that are made during the reporting period,
 the full name and address of the persons to whom the expenditures
 are made, and the dates and purposes of the expenditures;
 (4)  the amount of each payment made during the
 reporting period from a political contribution if the payment is
 not a political expenditure, the full name and address of the person
 to whom the payment is made, and the date and purpose of the
 payment;
 (5)  the total amount or a specific listing of the
 political contributions of $50 or less accepted and the total
 amount or a specific listing of the political expenditures of $50 or
 less made during the reporting period;
 (6)  the total amount of all political contributions
 accepted and the total amount of all political expenditures made
 during the reporting period;
 (7)  the name of each candidate or officeholder who
 benefits from a direct campaign expenditure made during the
 reporting period by the person or committee required to file the
 report, and the office sought or held, excluding a direct campaign
 expenditure that is made by the principal political committee of a
 political party on behalf of a slate of two or more nominees of that
 party; [and]
 (8)  as of the last day of a reporting period for which
 the person is required to file a report, the total amount of
 political contributions accepted, including interest or other
 income on those contributions, that are on hand or maintained in one
 or more accounts in which political contributions are deposited as
 of the last day of the reporting period;
 (9)  the following amounts received during the
 reporting period:
 (A)  any interest earned on a political
 contribution;
 (B)  any proceeds of the sale of an asset or
 investment purchased with a political contribution; and
 (C)  any other gain received from a political
 contribution; and
 (10)  the full name and address of each person from whom
 an amount described by Subdivision (9) is received, the date the
 amount is received, and the purpose for which the amount is
 received.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 254, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 254.0313 to read as follows:
 Sec. 254.0313.  INVESTMENTS ARE REPORTABLE EXPENDITURES.
 The purchase of an asset or investment with money received as a
 political contribution is required to be reported as a political
 expenditure under Section 254.031(a)(3).
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 254.0611, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the contents required by Sections 254.031
 and 254.061, each report by a candidate for a judicial office
 covered by Subchapter F, Chapter 253, must include:
 (1)  [the total amount of political contributions,
 including interest or other income, maintained in one or more
 accounts in which political contributions are deposited as of the
 last day of the reporting period;
 [(2)]  for each individual from whom the person filing
 the report has accepted political contributions that in the
 aggregate exceed $50 and that are accepted during the reporting
 period:
 (A)  the principal occupation and job title of the
 individual and the full name of the employer of the individual or of
 the law firm of which the individual or the individual's spouse is a
 member, if any; or
 (B)  if the individual is a child, the full name of
 the law firm of which either of the individual's parents is a
 member, if any;
 (2) [(3)]  a specific listing of each asset valued at
 $500 or more that was purchased with political contributions and on
 hand as of the last day of the reporting period;
 (3) [(4)]  for each political contribution accepted by
 the person filing the report but not received as of the last day of
 the reporting period:
 (A)  the full name and address of the person
 making the contribution;
 (B)  the amount of the contribution; and
 (C)  the date of the contribution; and
 (4) [(5)]  for each outstanding loan to the person
 filing the report as of the last day of the reporting period:
 (A)  the full name and address of the person or
 financial institution making the loan; and
 (B)  the full name and address of each guarantor
 of the loan other than the candidate.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a report under Chapter 254, Election Code, that is required to be
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A report under
 Chapter 254, Election Code, that is required to be filed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the report is required to be filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *