Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1462 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1462
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; April 5, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of subdivision platting requirements in
 certain counties near the international border of this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The purpose of this Act is to allow the state and
 certain counties to be affected parties in claims against
 unscrupulous developers who violate subdivision platting
 requirements under Subchapter B, Chapter 232, Local Government
 Code, since the state and counties may reasonably be expected to
 mitigate or ameliorate the conditions created by those developers.
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.037, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The attorney general, or the district attorney,
 criminal district attorney, county attorney with felony
 responsibilities, or county attorney of the county may take any
 action necessary in a court of competent jurisdiction on behalf of
 the state, an affected county subject to this subchapter, or
 affected [on behalf of] residents to:
 (1)  enjoin the violation or threatened violation of
 the model rules adopted under Section 16.343, Water Code;
 (2)  enjoin the violation or threatened violation of a
 requirement of this subchapter or a rule adopted by the
 commissioners court under this subchapter;
 (3)  recover civil or criminal penalties, attorney's
 fees, litigation costs, and investigation costs; [and]
 (4)  require platting or replatting under Section
 232.040;
 (5)  recover funds paid to the subdivider or an agent of
 the subdivider, with interest;
 (6)  freeze the assets of the subdivider or an agent of
 the subdivider; and
 (7)  void or rescind contracts.
 (e)  If the state or a county is a party to the claim, funds
 recovered under Subsection (a)(5) must be divided between the
 affected residents and the governmental entity or entities, with 50
 percent of the recovery to be paid to the affected residents and the
 other 50 percent to be paid to the governmental entity or entities.
 Multiple governmental entities that are party to the claim must
 divide money received under this subsection equally among the
 entities.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *