Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1463 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1463
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the processing fee charged for a dishonored payment
 device.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 3.506, Business &
 Commerce Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  On return of a payment device to the holder following
 dishonor of the payment device by a payor, the holder, the holder's
 assignee, agent, or representative, or any other person retained by
 the holder to seek collection of the face value of the dishonored
 payment device may charge the drawer or indorser a maximum
 [reasonable] processing fee of [not more than] $30.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *