Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1471 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1471
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
44 April 27, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
55 Nays 0; April 27, 2011, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to land reclamation projects using tires.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 361, Health and Safety
1313 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.1126 to read as follows:
1414 Sec. 361.1126. LAND RECLAMATION PROJECTS USING TIRES.
1515 (a) In this section:
1616 (1) "Land reclamation" means the process of restoring
1717 an area of excavated, deteriorated, or disturbed land to its
1818 approximate natural grade and to prepare or reclaim the land for
1919 reuse.
2020 (2) "Scrap tire" has the meaning assigned by Section
2121 361.112.
2222 (b) A person may not begin a land reclamation project using
2323 scrap tires without a permit issued by the commission under this
2424 section.
2525 (c) A person may not use scrap tires for a land reclamation
2626 project unless the tires are shredded, split, or quartered as
2727 provided by commission rule. The commission may grant an exception
2828 to this requirement if the commission finds that circumstances
2929 warrant the exception.
3030 (d) The commission may not grant a permit for a land
3131 reclamation project using scrap tires before:
3232 (1) the commission receives comments or suggestions
3333 from:
3434 (A) the governing body of any municipality in the
3535 corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction of which the
3636 proposed project is located;
3737 (B) the commissioners court of each county in
3838 which the proposed project is located;
3939 (C) each groundwater conservation district, if
4040 any, in which the proposed project is located; and
4141 (D) each regional planning commission, council
4242 of governments, or similar regional planning agency created under
4343 Chapter 391, Local Government Code, if any, for the region in which
4444 the proposed project is located; or
4545 (2) the earlier of:
4646 (A) the 61st day after the date the application
4747 to request a permit for the project is submitted to the commission;
4848 or
4949 (B) the day following the first date the
5050 commissioners court of each county in which the proposed project is
5151 located has conducted two regularly scheduled meetings following
5252 the date the application was submitted to the commission.
5353 (e) The application to request a permit for a land
5454 reclamation project using scrap tires must include at a minimum:
5555 (1) a legal description of the area to be reclaimed;
5656 (2) a map clearly identifying the area to be reclaimed
5757 and the topography of the area;
5858 (3) an affidavit from the property owner certifying
5959 that the reclamation project complies with this section and the
6060 rules adopted under this section;
6161 (4) a demonstration of the seasonal high groundwater
6262 level in the area in which the proposed project is located; and
6363 (5) an analysis and evaluation of the environmental
6464 impacts on the soil and groundwater in the area of the proposed
6565 project that compares the impact of using scrap tires for the
6666 proposed reclamation project to the impact of at least one
6767 reasonable alternative method of land reclamation for the proposed
6868 project.
6969 (f) A person submitting an application to request a permit
7070 under this section must mail a copy of the application to the
7171 commissioners court of each county in which the proposed project is
7272 located and provide notice to the other entities listed in
7373 Subsection (d). Proof of notice must be provided in the form and
7474 manner described by commission rule.
7575 (g) The executive director may request that a person
7676 submitting an application to request a permit under this section
7777 provide additional information if the executive director
7878 determines that the application does not address all applicable
7979 requirements of this section or commission rules adopted under this
8080 section or any potential risks to public health or the environment.
8181 (h) The commission may not grant a permit under this section
8282 if the commission receives notice before issuing the permit that
8383 the proposed project violates a local regulation, ordinance, order,
8484 or other law in the area in which the proposed project is located.
8585 (i) The commission by rule shall:
8686 (1) prescribe minimum standards to protect the soil
8787 and water for a land reclamation project using scrap tires; and
8888 (2) adopt application forms and procedures for the
8989 permitting process under this section, including the adoption of a
9090 procedure that allows the electronic submission of applications.
9191 (j) The commission may amend, extend, transfer, or renew a
9292 permit issued under this section as provided by this chapter and
9393 commission rule.
9494 (k) The notice and hearing procedures provided by this
9595 subchapter apply to a permit issued, amended, extended, or renewed
9696 under this section.
9797 (l) The commission may, for good cause, deny, revoke,
9898 suspend, annul, or amend a permit under this section for reasons
9999 concerning public health and safety, air or water pollution, land
100100 use, or a violation of this section as provided by Section 361.089.
101101 SECTION 2. (a) Before September 1, 2012, the Texas
102102 Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt any rules required
103103 to implement Section 361.1126, Health and Safety Code, as added by
104104 this Act.
105105 (b) On or after the effective date of this Act, any person
106106 responsible for an ongoing or pending land reclamation project
107107 using scrap tires that has not yet placed the tires below ground may
108108 not place the tires below ground until the person has obtained a
109109 permit under Section 361.1126, Health and Safety Code, as added by
110110 this Act.
111111 (c) To the extent that a land reclamation project using
112112 scrap tires has placed tires below ground before the effective date
113113 of this Act, the project is subject to the law in effect on the date
114114 the tires were placed below ground, and that law is continued in
115115 effect for that purpose.
116116 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
117117 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
118118 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
119119 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
120120 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
121121 * * * * *