Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1472 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Shapiro S.B. No. 1472
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 April 26, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 26, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1472 By:  Harris


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the coordinated dissemination of online information
 regarding the operation and performance of certain for-profit
 educational entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0778 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0778.  ONLINE INFORMATION REGARDING CERTAIN
 FOR-PROFIT EDUCATIONAL ENTITIES. (a)  In this section,
 "commission" means the Texas Workforce Commission.
 (b)  The board and commission jointly shall develop a
 comprehensive strategy to improve and coordinate the dissemination
 of online information regarding the operation and performance of
 for-profit private postsecondary educational institutions and
 for-profit career schools or colleges in this state. As part of the
 comprehensive strategy, the board and the commission shall compile,
 share, and compare existing data and other applicable information
 under the control of each agency and shall organize that
 information as nearly as possible according to the categories of
 information required for the online resumes of lower-division
 public institutions under Section 51A.103.
 (c)  For each for-profit private postsecondary educational
 institution or for-profit career school or college that the board
 or commission identifies as doing business in this state, the board
 and commission shall each publish on the agency's Internet website
 any information described by Subsection (b) that the board and
 commission jointly determine would assist a person in deciding
 whether to enroll in the institution, school, or college or in
 identifying or choosing which institution, school, or college to
 attend. The websites must:
 (1)  present information regarding those institutions,
 schools, and colleges in a manner that is:
 (A)  to the extent practicable, consistent among
 the institutions, schools, and colleges; and
 (B)  easily accessible and readily understandable
 to the public; and
 (2)  allow for interactive online reporting of
 complaints from the public about a specific institution, school, or
 college.
 (d)  The board and commission shall each refer any complaint
 the agency receives under Subsection (c)(2) regarding the operation
 and performance of a for-profit private postsecondary educational
 institution or for-profit career school or college to the consumer
 protection division of the attorney general's office for timely
 investigation and resolution of the complaint.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *