E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1648
|
Journal Page: 6367
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6367
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4538
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4031
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3336
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1287
|
Journal Page: 4836
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4836
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4836
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4731
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
2-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 4730
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4729
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1320
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1320
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1320
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1341
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|