By: West S.B. No. 149 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 13, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to rules adopted and reporting required under the school district college credit program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 28.009, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The agency shall coordinate with the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board as necessary in administering this section. The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary concerning the duties under this section of a school district. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board may adopt rules as necessary concerning the duties under this section of a public institution of higher education. SECTION 2. Effective September 1, 2011, Subsection (c), Section 28.009, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (c) Each school district shall annually report to the agency: (1) the number of district students, including career and technical students, who have participated in the program [and earned college credit]; and (2) the [cumulative number of] courses in which participating district students [have enrolled and college credit hours the students] have earned high school credit under this section. SECTION 3. Effective September 1, 2013, Subsection (c), Section 28.009, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (c) The commissioner and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall share data as necessary to enable school districts to comply with this subsection. Each school district shall annually report to the agency: (1) the number of district students, including career and technical students, who have participated in the program and earned college credit; and (2) the cumulative number of courses in which participating district students have enrolled and college credit hours the students have earned. SECTION 4. Effective September 1, 2013, Section 28.009, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: (c-1) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall collect student course credit data from public institutions of higher education as necessary for purposes of Subsection (c). SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *