House | 05/22/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5048 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 4116 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2653 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2653 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2550 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1436 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1436 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1436 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 West | Journal Page: 1434 |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 675 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 675 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |