House | 05/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
05/16/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
05/13/2011 | Posting rule suspended | |||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2655 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 1566 |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 1160 |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1160 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1160 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1070 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 1070 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 462 | |
Senate | 02/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 217 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 217 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |