E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3108
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4802
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4770
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4796
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4796
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|