House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3237 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1544 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 936 |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 217 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 217 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |