Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1539 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1539


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the goal of installing additional capacity for
 generating renewable energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 39.904(a) and (c), Utilities Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
 shall establish a goal [target] of 10,000 megawatts of installed
 renewable capacity by January 1, 2025.  The cumulative installed
 renewable capacity in this state shall total [2,280 megawatts by
 January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009, 4,264
 megawatts by January 1, 2011,] 5,256 megawatts by January 1, 2013,
 and 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015. Of the cumulative renewable
 energy technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of
 this subsection after September 1, 2011 [2005], a total of [the
 commission shall establish a target of having] at least 500
 megawatts of capacity from [a] renewable energy technologies
 [technology] other than [a source using] wind energy technologies
 shall be installed by January 1, 2017.
 (c)  The [Not later than January 1, 2000, the] commission
 shall adopt rules necessary to administer and enforce this section.
 At a minimum, the rules shall:
 (1)  establish the minimum annual renewable energy
 requirement, including a minimum annual requirement for the
 installation of generating capacity from renewable energy
 technologies other than wind energy technologies, for each retail
 electric provider, municipally owned utility, and electric
 cooperative operating in this state in a manner reasonably
 calculated by the commission to produce, on a statewide basis,
 compliance with the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a); and
 (2)  specify reasonable performance standards that all
 renewable capacity additions must meet to count against the
 requirement prescribed by Subsection (a) and that:
 (A)  are designed and operated so as to maximize
 the energy output from the capacity additions in accordance with
 then-current industry standards; and
 (B)  encourage the development, construction, and
 operation of new renewable energy projects at those sites in this
 state that have the greatest economic potential for capture and
 development of this state's environmentally beneficial renewable
 resources.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.