E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6688
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1720
|
Journal Page: 6688
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6687
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5045
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4646
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5970
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5970
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5959
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5959
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5959
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3731
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3731
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3731
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3731
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5080
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1361
|
Journal Page: 5079
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5079
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5079
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5005
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5005
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 5005
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4860
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4360
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Larson
|
Journal Page: 4359
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4359
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1291
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1046
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|