Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1543 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1543


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of an independent school district to
 invest in corporate bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2256, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2256.0204 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2256.0204.  AUTHORIZED INVESTMENTS:  INDEPENDENT
 SCHOOL DISTRICTS. (a)  In this section, "corporate bond" means a
 senior secured debt obligation issued by a domestic business entity
 and rated not lower than "AA-" or the equivalent by a nationally
 recognized investment rating firm. The term does not include a debt
 obligation that:
 (1)  on conversion, would result in the holder becoming
 a stockholder or shareholder in the entity, or any affiliate or
 subsidiary of the entity, that issued the debt obligation; or
 (2)  is an unsecured debt obligation.
 (b)  This section applies only to an independent school
 district that qualifies as an issuer as defined by Section
 1371.001.
 (c)  In addition to authorized investments permitted by this
 subchapter, an independent school district subject to this section
 may purchase, sell, and invest its funds and funds under its control
 in corporate bonds that, at the time of purchase, are rated by a
 nationally recognized investment rating firm "AA-" or the
 equivalent and have a stated final maturity that is not later than
 the third anniversary of the date the corporate bonds were
 purchased.
 (d)  An independent school district subject to this section
 is not authorized by this section to:
 (1)  invest in the aggregate more than 15 percent of its
 monthly average fund balance, excluding bond proceeds, reserves,
 and other funds held for the payment of debt service, in corporate
 bonds; or
 (2)  invest more than 25 percent of the funds invested
 in corporate bonds in any one domestic business entity, including
 subsidiaries and affiliates of the entity.
 (e)  An independent school district subject to this section
 may purchase, sell, and invest its funds and funds under its control
 in corporate bonds if the governing body of the district:
 (1)  amends its investment policy to authorize
 corporate bonds as an eligible investment;
 (2)  adopts procedures to provide for:
 (A)  monitoring rating changes in corporate bonds
 acquired with public funds; and
 (B)  liquidating the investment in corporate
 bonds; and
 (3)  identifies the funds eligible to be invested in
 corporate bonds.
 (f)  The investment officer of an independent school
 district, acting on behalf of the district, shall sell corporate
 bonds in which the district has invested its funds not later than
 the seventh day after the date a nationally recognized investment
 rating firm:
 (1)  issues a release that places the corporate bonds
 or the domestic business entity that issued the corporate bonds on
 negative credit watch or the equivalent, if the corporate bonds are
 rated "AA-" or the equivalent at the time the release is issued; or
 (2)  changes the rating on the corporate bonds to a
 rating lower than "AA-" or the equivalent.
 (g)  Corporate bonds are not an eligible investment for a
 public funds investment pool.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1543 passed the Senate on
 May 6, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays 3;
 May 25, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 27,
 Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1543 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 126,
 Nays 20, two present not voting; May 27, 2011, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 6, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor